NH HB62 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to adjusting the road toll.
Title
Relative to adjusting the road toll.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. Leonard Turcotte [R] | Rep. Yury Polozov [R] |
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB62-FN 02/03/2023 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 13 |
2023-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Public Works and Highways |