NH HB619 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting gender transition procedures for minors, relative to sex and gender in public schools, and relative to the definition of conversion therapy.
Title
Prohibiting gender transition procedures for minors, relative to sex and gender in public schools, and relative to the definition of conversion therapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Nikki McCarter [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] |
Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Sheila Seidel [R] | Rep. Alicia Lekas [R] | Rep. David Love [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/07/2023 10:00 am State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB619 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207