NH HB619 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transactions exempt from consumer protection regulations.
Title
Relative to transactions exempt from consumer protection regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 12 |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/26/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22 |