NH HB618 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB618
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-26 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to wage garnishment with child support payments.
Title
Relative to wage garnishment with child support payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-2396h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 33 |
2024-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2023-2396: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 33 |
2023-11-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-2396h 10/31/2023 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 3 |
2023-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 41 |
2023-08-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-03-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/15/2023 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB618 (Carry Over) 2023-08-30 - Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208