NH HB616 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a cost of living adjustment for retirees in the state retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a cost of living adjustment for retirees in the state retirement system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 12 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Sen. Carson Floor Amendment 2218s (Y: 11 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 219 N: 149 NV: 10 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51
2019-05-31SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 12Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-2218s, Regular Calendar 11Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-16SenateHearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1268h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-149 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 25
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1268h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 25
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1268h for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6
2019-03-25HouseFinance Division I Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-03-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-14HouseFinance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 85
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0094h: Motion Adopted DV 250-91 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 85
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0094h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 85
2019-02-19HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-19HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0094h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 19
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=674&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB616
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=655&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=655
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=655
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&v=SP&id=655
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=150&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0616&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB616&ddlsponsors=&lsr=674
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=160&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0616&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB616&ddlsponsors=&lsr=674
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=161&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0616&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB616&ddlsponsors=&lsr=674

Bill Comments

feedback