NH HB614 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the state and political subdivisions from payment of the costs of compliance with the renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Exempting the state and political subdivisions from payment of the costs of compliance with the renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Rep. Juliet Harvey-Bolia [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 356 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/10/2021 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-10-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/04/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/04/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99357402693 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-150 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0156h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0156h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 24 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92874903669 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB614 (Carry Over) 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204