NH HB614 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting the state and political subdivisions from payment of the costs of compliance with the renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Exempting the state and political subdivisions from payment of the costs of compliance with the renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Vose [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] |
Rep. Juliet Harvey-Bolia [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/22/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 12 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-2238h: Motion Adopted DV 177-158 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2021-2238h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2238h 11/10/2021 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 45 |
2021-10-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/10/2021 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-10-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/04/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/04/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2021-09-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/15/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-08-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-08-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/07/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing: 03/10/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99357402693 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-150 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0156h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 86 |
2021-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0156h (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 24 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92874903669 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB614 (Carry Over) 2021-10-20 - Full Committee Work Session: 11/10/2021 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204