NH HB613 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB613
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to state aid to school districts with special education pupils and relative to pooled risk management for unanticipated special education cost recovery.
Title
Relative to state aid to school districts with special education pupils and relative to pooled risk management for unanticipated special education cost recovery.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] |
Rep. James Allard [R] | Rep. Walter Spilsbury [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-10-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 613-FN-LOCAL 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; ) House Calendar 48 P. 11 |
2021-10-06 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-09-13 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2021-03-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660 |
2021-03-11 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/16/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96814127480 |
2021-03-11 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/16/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96814127480 |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 32 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0356h: Amendment Adopted DV 225-132 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 32 |
2021-02-24 | House | Amendment # 2021-0356h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 32 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0356h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 18 |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99866065403 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91325381640 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB613 (Carry Over) 2021-10-29 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 613-FN-LOCAL 10/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; )
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=127&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB613 |