NH HB612 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 145; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 145; Eff. 8/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to livestock and meat inspection.
Title
Relative to livestock and meat inspection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/16/2017; Chapter 145; Eff. 8/15/2017 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1316s (Rep. John T. O'Connor): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 6 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1316s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1316s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1316s, 04/20/2017; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0652h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 103 |
2017-03-08 | House | Amendment #2017-0652h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 103 |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0652h for 03/08/2017 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-02-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/21/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 21 |