NH HB607 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB607
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Special Order (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 161-172 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Special Order (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 161-172 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Establishing local education savings accounts for students.
Title
Establishing local education savings accounts for students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - House - Table (Y: 187 N: 170 NV: 36 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Special Order (Rep. Ammon): Motion Failed DV 161-172 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-10 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Wolf): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 187-170 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2021-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-2250h 11/16/2021 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 28 |
2021-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-02-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99866065403 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Carry Over) 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207