NH HB607 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB607
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing local education savings accounts for students.
Title
Establishing local education savings accounts for students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-05 | House | Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-02-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99866065403 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98073405784 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 56 |
Same As/Similar To
HB607 (Carry Over) 2021-10-05 - Executive Session: 11/09/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207