NH HB605 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 295; Eff: 10/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 295; Eff: 10/27/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal penalties for possession, transfer, or manufacture of animal fighting paraphernalia with the intent to be present at, aiding in, or contributing to such fighting.
Title
Relative to criminal penalties for possession, transfer, or manufacture of animal fighting paraphernalia with the intent to be present at, aiding in, or contributing to such fighting.
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Rep. Kristina Schultz [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 215 N: 124 NV: 27 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-30 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/29/2019; Chapter 295; Eff: 10/27/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2638e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2638e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1953s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1953s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1953s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1953s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1953s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Hearing: 05/09/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 215-124 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 102 |
2019-03-19 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Pearl): Motion Failed DV 140-188 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 102 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 24 |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 21 |