NH HB604 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1753
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-28 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1753
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedures for approval of plans, specifications, and costs of school building construction or renovation.
Title
Relative to the procedures for approval of plans, specifications, and costs of school building construction or renovation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1753 | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 28 (Vote 24-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.1504 | |
2012-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/20/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-21 | House Division II Work Session: 2/23/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 | |
2012-02-17 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 3/8/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2012-02-15 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 16, PG.913-914 | |
2012-02-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2778h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.913-914 | |
2012-02-15 | House Amendment #2778h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.913-914 | |
2011-10-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2778h; House Calendar 11, PG.720-721 | |
2011-10-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2778h for Feb 15 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.683 | |
2011-10-04 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 (If Necessary Continued 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207) | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-09-15 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-24 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-09 | House Public Hearing: 2/15/2011 4:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 193 |