NH HB601 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB601
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-28 - Division II Work Session: 09/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-08-28 - Division II Work Session: 09/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 36
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state participation in the Medicaid direct certification program for free and reduced price school meals.
Title
Relative to state participation in the Medicaid direct certification program for free and reduced price school meals.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Mary Freitas [D] |
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Jacqueline Chretien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 09/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 36 |
2023-03-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/28/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-24 | House | Division Work Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 74 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0444h: Motion Adopted DV 205-151 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 74 |
2023-02-22 | House | Lay HB601 on Table (Rep. Belcher): Motion Failed DV 161-195 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 74 |
2023-02-22 | House | FLAM # 2023-0444h (): Amendment Adopted DV 176-174 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 74 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0444h 02/06/2023 |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/06/2023 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 19 |
2023-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/01/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB601 (Carry Over) 2023-08-28 - Division II Work Session: 09/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 36