NH HB601 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-11 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0648h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the privacy of personal information retained by a health or social service agency and prohibiting the sharing of such information between such agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the privacy of personal information retained by a health or social service agency and prohibiting the sharing of such information between such agencies.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0648h
2021-03-11HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 74
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92769044991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 56

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback