NH HB599 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Title
Relative to the therapeutic cannabis medical oversight board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 37 |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 16 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95885653389 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 56 |