NH HB589 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Reconsider HB 589 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Reconsider HB 589 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the law relative to providing certain parameters for access to reproductive health care facilities.
Title
Repealing the law relative to providing certain parameters for access to reproductive health care facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] | Rep. Kevin Scully [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 165 NV: 17 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Reconsider HB 589 (Rep. White): Motion Failed Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 28 |
2017-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-165 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 26 |
2017-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) |
2017-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 20 |