NH HB583 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the termination of child support.
Title
Relative to the termination of child support.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0793h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0793h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0793h 03/07/2023 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 10:50 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 21 |