NH HB580 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to bonding construction projects for the department of natural and cultural resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to bonding construction projects for the department of natural and cultural resources.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 3 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback