NH HB580 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 05/27/2011; Chapter 0101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 05/27/2011; Chapter 0101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study collective bargaining by public employees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study collective bargaining by public employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Raymond White [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - CONCUR (REP HAWKINS) (Y: 352 N: 10 NV: 34 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - OTP/AM 1174H(NT) (Y: 228 N: 139 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - LAY ON THE TABLE (REP G.RICHARDSON) (Y: 132 N: 235 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1275H(NT) (REP BAROODY) (Y: 137 N: 229 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1229H (REP SHURTLEFF) (Y: 136 N: 224 NV: 38 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - OTP/AM 1174H(NT) (Y: 228 N: 139 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - LAY ON THE TABLE (REP G.RICHARDSON) (Y: 132 N: 235 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1275H(NT) (REP BAROODY) (Y: 137 N: 229 NV: 32 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - FLAM 1229H (REP SHURTLEFF) (Y: 136 N: 224 NV: 38 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Signed By Governor 05/27/2011; Effective 05/27/2011; Chapter 0101 | |
2011-05-18 | House Enrolled; House Journal 44, PG.1564 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 18, Pg.364 | |
2011-05-04 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1527s(NT) (Rep Hawkins): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 352-10; House Journal 42, PG.1448-1450 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 14 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1527s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 14, Pg.278 | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Committee Amendment 1527s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14, Pg.278 | |
2011-04-21 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1527s, New Title, 4/27/11; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Hearing: 4/21/11, Room 100, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12, Pg.244 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1174h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-139; House Journal 34, PG.1136-1159 | |
2011-03-30 | House Lay on the Table (Rep G.Richardson): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 132-235; House Journal 34, PG.1155-1157 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1174h(NT); House Journal 34, PG.1136-1155 | |
2011-03-30 | House Floor Amendment #2011-1275h (New Title) (Rep Baroody) Failed, Regular Calendar 137-229; House Journal 34, PG.1152-1155 | |
2011-03-30 | House Floor Amendment #2011-1229h (Rep Shurtleff) Failed, Regular Calendar 136-224; House Journal 34, PG.1145-1152 | |
2011-03-30 | House Amendment #1174h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG.1136-1145 | |
2011-03-24 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 27, PG.821 | |
2011-03-24 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1174h (New Title); House Calendar 27, PG.844-853 | |
2011-03-24 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1174h(NT) for Mar 30 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27, PG.821 | |
2011-03-17 | House Continued Executive Session: 3/24/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-03-17 | House Continued Executive Session: 3/23/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-03-17 | House Executive Session: 3/22/2011 2:10 PM Legislative Office Building 306-308 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-03-17 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/22/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-03-15 | House Suspend House Rules to Allow Reporting Deadline to Be Extended No Later Than Mar 24 and House Action No Later Than Mar 31 (Reps Bettencourt & Wallner): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by Required Two-Thirds; House Journal 26, PG.693 | |
2011-03-14 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-03-09 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/11/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306-308 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/4/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-03-02 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Full Committee Work Session: 3/4/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 (Orig Legislative Office Building 201-203) | |
2011-03-02 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/4/2011 1:00 PM Representative's Hall (Orig Legislative Office Building 201-203) | |
2011-01-24 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Special Committee on Public Employee Pensions Reform |