NH HB578 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB578
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to services for the developmentally disabled.
Title
Relative to services for the developmentally disabled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-22 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-10-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-10-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-30 | House | Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)