NH HB578 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB578

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 32; I. Sec. 6-8 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec 9-11 Eff: 9/22/2020 III. Rem. Eff: 07/24/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the safety of residents and employees in long-term care facilities, relative to cost controls in long-term care, and relative to the reimbursement of costs of training nursing assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the safety of residents and employees in long-term care facilities, relative to cost controls in long-term care, and relative to the reimbursement of costs of training nursing assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/24/2020; Chapter 32; I. Sec. 6-8 Eff: 01/01/2021 II. Sec 9-11 Eff: 9/22/2020 III. Rem. Eff: 07/24/2020
2020-07-10HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-07-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted DV 282-43 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-1290s and 2020-1531s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-1531s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1290s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1290s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-05-29SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29Senate5. Webinar ID: 971 5945 7302 Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29Senate(Correction to the OneTap dial in numbers) 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 19292056099,,97159457302# or 13017158592,,97159457302# Senate Calendar 21A
2020-05-29Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location):1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition to the bill, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN O3jklOmFTaCH-v4pwOEJEw Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29SenateRemote Hearing: 06/02/2020, 08:35 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1277s; Senate Calendar 21
2020-05-29SenateRemote Hearing: 06/02/2020, 08:30 am; Senate Calendar 21
2020-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2020-01-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2826h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 48
2020-01-08HouseAmendment # 2019-2826h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 48
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 11
2019-10-22HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-10-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/31/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-10-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HouseRetained in Committee
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-30HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 20

Same As/Similar To

HB578 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2826h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback