NH HB578 | 2017 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to banning abortion after viability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to banning abortion after viability.


Roll Calls

2017-03-09 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 170 N: 189 NV: 14 Abs: 22) [FAIL]


2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted DV 280-82 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 22
2017-03-09HouseAmendment #2017-0440h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 170-189 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 19
2017-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0440h (NT) for 03/08/2017 (Vote 10-7; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-15House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-02-08House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2017-01-20HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments