NH HB578 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state board of education compliance with unfunded federal education mandates.
Title
Relative to state board of education compliance with unfunded federal education mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - OTP (Y: 204 N: 136 NV: 57 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass (Rep Cordelli): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-136; House Journal 24, PG. 875-877 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation for Mar 11 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 421 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 3:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 230 |