NH HB569 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the placement of all new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the placement of all new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-15 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1761s (Y: 8 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 171 N: 139 NV: 55 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2014-01-22 - House - Table (Y: 151 N: 168 NV: 46 Abs: 30) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13
2014-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment 1761s, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 8Y-16N
2014-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1761s, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18
2014-03-13SenateHearing: 3/19/14, Rooms 306-308, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10
2014-02-19SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2014-02-06HouseThird Reading and Passage
2014-01-23HouseReferral declined by Chair of Ways & Means per House Rule 46 (f)
2014-01-22HouseReferred to Ways and Means
2014-01-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #2377h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 171-139
2014-01-22HouseLay on Table (Rep. Vaillancourt) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 151-168
2014-01-22HouseLay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts) Motion Failed DV 160-160
2014-01-22HouseAdopt Amendment #2377h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2377h for Jan 8 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 1
2013-10-22HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-10-22HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-08-20HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-08-07HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-06-25HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-06-14HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Briefing on Electric Transmission and Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseContinued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED==
2013-02-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Representatives Hall
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.200

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback