NH HB569 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the placement of all new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the placement of all new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-25HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2377h for Jan 8 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-22HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-10-22HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-09-24HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-08-20HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-08-07HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-06-25HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-06-14HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Briefing on Electric Transmission and Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-27HouseContinued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED==
2013-02-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 2/21/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Representatives Hall
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.200

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback