NH HB568 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire to be buried.
Title
Requiring new electric transmission lines in New Hampshire to be buried.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurence Rappaport [R] | Rep. Beatriz Pastor-Bodmer [D] | Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] |
Rep. Sidney Lovett [D] | Rep. Skip Reilly [R] | Rep. Robert Theberge [R] | Rep. Larry Enman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 1 |
2013-10-22 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-10-22 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-09-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-08-20 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-08-07 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/20/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-06-25 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/6/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-06-14 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Briefing on Electric Transmission and Work Session: 6/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 2/14/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:15 Amendment Representatives Hall |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG.200 |