NH HB567 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing breast cancer and pediatric cancer special number plates.
Title
Establishing breast cancer and pediatric cancer special number plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Guy Comtois [R] | Rep. Herb Vadney [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Daniel Tamburello [R] |
Rep. Raymond Howard [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] | Rep. Richard Gordon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 11 |
2015-09-21 | House | Executive Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-05-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 231 |