NH HB564 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 216-164 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 216-164 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to possession of firearms on school property.
Title
Relative to possession of firearms on school property.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] | Rep. Mary Mulligan [D] |
Rep. Mary Eisner [D] | Rep. Beth Rodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 216 N: 164 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 197 N: 146 NV: 24 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment 2247s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 213 N: 159 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 154 NV: 21 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 145 N: 202 NV: 22 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Table (Y: 148 N: 206 NV: 15 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 197 N: 146 NV: 24 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment 2247s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 213 N: 159 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 154 NV: 21 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 145 N: 202 NV: 22 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Table (Y: 148 N: 206 NV: 15 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 216-164 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 41 |
2019-08-12 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2591c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 197-146 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 44 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2591c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2591c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Fuller Clark Replaces Senator French; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/19/2019 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Chandley, Feltes, French; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Luneau, Myler, Heath, Cushing 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-06-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2247s and Requests CofC (Reps. Myler, Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 41 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2247s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Morgan Floor Amendment # 2019-2247s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1964s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1964s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1239h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-159 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2019-04-04 | House | Amendment # 2019-1239h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 212-145 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 3 |
2019-03-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1239h (NT) for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 4 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-03-06 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/26/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 62 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0532h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-154 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 60 |
2019-02-27 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 145-202 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 58 |
2019-02-27 | House | Lay on Table (): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 148-206 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0532h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 53 |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0532h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 18 |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20 |