NH HB564 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1964s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to possession of firearms on school property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to possession of firearms on school property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 213 N: 159 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 154 NV: 21 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 145 N: 202 NV: 22 Abs: 31) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - Table (Y: 148 N: 206 NV: 15 Abs: 31) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1964s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-24SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1239h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-159 04/04/2019
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1239h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 212-145 04/04/2019
2019-03-27HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-27HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1239h (NT) for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 4
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-03-06House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 03/26/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2019-02-27HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 62
2019-02-27HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0532h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-154 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 60
2019-02-27HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 145-202 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 58
2019-02-27HouseLay on Table (): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 148-206 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 54
2019-02-27HouseAmendment # 2019-0532h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 53
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0532h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 18
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/19/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=487&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB564
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=472&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=472
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=472
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=44&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=487
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=46&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=487
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=47&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=487
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=146&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0564&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB564&ddlsponsors=&lsr=487

Bill Comments

feedback