NH HB561 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 284-92 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 284-92 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to potential jurors excused from jury duty due to a lack of residency in the county of jury service.
Title
Relative to potential jurors excused from jury duty due to a lack of residency in the county of jury service.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 284-92 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 15 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed DV 187-189 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 15 |
2021-03-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 53 |
2021-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/10/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95164452682 |
2021-03-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/02/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95501229688 |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing: 02/23/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91815905671 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 53 |