NH HB559 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - II. Remainder Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-16 - II. Remainder Effective 09/13/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the general banking laws of the state and relative to electronic funds transfers.
Title
Relative to the general banking laws of the state and relative to electronic funds transfers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-16 | House | II. Remainder Effective 09/13/2013 |
2013-07-16 | House | I. Section 18 Effective as Provided in Section 19 |
2013-07-16 | House | Signed By Governor 07/15/2013; Chapter 0238 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1711 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2082e Adopted [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1655 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2082e Adopted |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1591s and 1921s(NT) (Rep Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1585 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1591s, 1921s New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2013-1921s New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1921s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1591s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1591s, Not Voted On; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1591s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0587h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.744-749 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0587h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.744-749 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0587h; House Calendar 22, PG.556-562 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0587h for Mar 13 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.501 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/28/2013 9:55 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.200 |