NH HB553 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the amendment of petitioned warrant articles.
Title
Relative to the amendment of petitioned warrant articles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2019-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 5 |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 19 |