NH HB535 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to community net metering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to community net metering.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 49
2017-02-21HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0447h
2017-02-21HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-02-08HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/14/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback