NH HB534 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-27 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-27 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to water assistance for natural disasters.
Title
Relative to water assistance for natural disasters.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] | Rep. Mary Hakken-Phillips [D] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 196 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; House Journal 16 |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-20 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/20/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Pearl, Watters; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/15/2023; Senate Journal 19 |
2023-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1900s and Requests CofC (Reps. Weyler, Leishman, Renzullo, Vail): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 74 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1900s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1900s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Special Order to when all 24 members are present in the Senate Chamber, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1900s, 05/18/2023; Senate Calendar 22A |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 209 |
2023-04-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 191-196 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 207 |
2023-03-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB534-FN-A 03/21/2023 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) |
2023-03-16 | House | Executive Session: 03/20/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-02-24 | House | Division Work Session: 03/03/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 179-177 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/08/2023 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 16 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 19 |