NH HB533 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the mathematics requirement for high school graduation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the mathematics requirement for high school graduation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2013-11-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2253h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar)
2013-09-03House=RESCEDULED=Retained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2013-09-03HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/18/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2013-03-05HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 3/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2013-02-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 12:05 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2013-02-15HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.199

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback