NH HB532 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB532
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Title
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Rep. Douglas Ley [D] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Linda Camarota [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2851h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 132 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2851h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 132 |
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 26 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-10-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-08-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)