NH HB532 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB532
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Title
Relative to payment for earned but unused vacation or personal time.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] |
Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Douglas Ley [D] | Rep. Linda Camarota [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-10-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-08-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/20/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 3 P. 18 |
Same As/Similar To
HB532 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2851h (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)