NH HB529 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-107 03/19/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a school district employee from assisting a person convicted of sexual misconduct with a minor child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a school district employee from assisting a person convicted of sexual misconduct with a minor child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - ITL (Y: 221 N: 107 NV: 38 Abs: 34) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 221-107 03/19/2019
2019-03-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-03-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 25
2019-02-21House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-20House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback