NH HB524 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 173; Eff: 07/10/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study issues and impediments to starting, running, and growing home and commercial day care facilities in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study issues and impediments to starting, running, and growing home and commercial day care facilities in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/10/2019; Chapter 173; Eff: 07/10/2019
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0162h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 41
2019-02-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0162h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 41
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0162h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15
2019-01-30HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-23HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback