NH HB523 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB523

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 21; Eff. 5/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the use and regulation of biometric information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the use and regulation of biometric information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 21; Eff. 5/15/2018
2018-05-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15
2018-05-01HouseEnrolled 04/26/2018
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-21SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-07Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/13/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 11
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4
2018-01-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2480h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 31
2018-01-03HouseAmendment # 2017-2480h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 31
2017-11-03HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2480h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-10-11House==RESCHEDULED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 308
2017-10-03HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-10-03House==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-15HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 17

Same As/Similar To

HB523 (Carry Over) 2017-11-03 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2480h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback