NH HB523 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to limitations on the use of biometric information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to limitations on the use of biometric information.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-08House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-08HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-02-02HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2017-01-18HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback