NH HB519 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the division of higher education to develop a policy on academic credit for a student's military occupation, military training, coursework, and experience.
Title
Requiring the division of higher education to develop a policy on academic credit for a student's military occupation, military training, coursework, and experience.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 08/03/2013; Chapter 0053 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 3/26/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.653 |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.408 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.198 |