NH HB516 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the time period for refiling a petition for annulment of a criminal record.
Title
Relative to the time period for refiling a petition for annulment of a criminal record.
Sponsors
Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] |
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Kendall Snow [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/27/2017; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-02-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0112h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 3 |
2017-02-02 | House | Amendment #2017-0112h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 3 |
2017-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0112h for 02/02/2017 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 16 |