NH HB512 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 233-103 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 233-103 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to dogs on hiking trails in state parks and state forests.
Title
Relative to dogs on hiking trails in state parks and state forests.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 233-103 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 63 |
2019-03-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Harrington) 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2 |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 15-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12 |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/05/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 18 |