NH HB500 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB500
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2018; Chapter 371; Eff. 09/16/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2018; Chapter 371; Eff. 09/16/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organizations that are authorized to issue decals.
Title
Relative to organizations that are authorized to issue decals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2018; Chapter 371; Eff. 09/16/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2002e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2002e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1815s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1815s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Floor Amendment # 2018-1815s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Special Order to 05/02/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/26/2018 Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 500 from the Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2431h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2431h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 |
2017-10-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2431h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-09-12 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-08-23 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2017 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
HB500 (Carry Over) 2017-10-26 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2431h for 01/03/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar)