NH HB484 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to budget committee recommendations on warrant articles.
Title
Relative to budget committee recommendations on warrant articles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - House - OTP (Y: 199 N: 173 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/20/2021; Senate Journal 16 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/19/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/19/2021, 09:20 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-173 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 37 |
2021-03-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 58 |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/08/2021 08:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96469796123 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 50 |