NH HB482 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regarding infestation of bed bugs in rental housing.
Title
Regarding infestation of bed bugs in rental housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by Governor 06/04/2013; Effective 01/01/2014; Chapter 0048 |
2013-04-24 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/2/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-02-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.480 |
2013-02-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 15, PG.272 |
2013-02-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 20 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.272 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/7/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.197 |