NH HB482 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.856-857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.856-857
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to county reimbursements for nursing home services.
Title
Relative to county reimbursements for nursing home services.
Sponsors
Rep. Spec Bowers [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.856-857 | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 22-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.555 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-02-22 | House Division III Work Session: 2/25/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 | |
2011-02-01 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==(Orig 11:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 11, PG. 188 |