NH HB475 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 30; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 30; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a shoreland septic system study commission.
Title
Establishing a shoreland septic system study commission.
Sponsors
Rep. Judith Spang [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Dennis Malloy [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 30; I. Sec. 3 Eff: 11/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 05/15/2019 |
2019-05-07 | House | Enrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1636e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1636e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:20 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0938h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 25 |
2019-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2019-0938h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 25 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0938h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 32 |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 15 |